NY A03714 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - signed chap.690
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - signed chap.690
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the disclosure of indoor mold history upon the sale of certain real property.
Title
Requires the disclosure of indoor mold history upon the sale of certain real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | signed chap.690 |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1753 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5097A |
2022-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.181 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.181 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05097 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3714