NY A03676 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - signed chap.454
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - signed chap.454
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to admission requirements for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs for certified teachers already holding a graduate degree; exempts certified teachers who already hold a graduate degree from the graduate record examination or substantially equivalent admission examination requirement.
Title
Relates to admission requirements for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs for certified teachers already holding a graduate degree; exempts certified teachers who already hold a graduate degree from the graduate record examination or substantially equivalent admission examination requirement.
Sponsors
Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] |
Asm. Pamela Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | Senate | signed chap.454 |
2017-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.633 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2487A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.506 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | print number 3676a |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S02487 (Same As) 2017-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3676A