NY A03551 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - print number 3551a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - print number 3551a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Phases in over five years full state funding of school district costs for school age children receiving special education programs and services; requires school districts to reduce their real property tax levy in an amount equal to the increase in state assistance.
Title
Phases in over five years full state funding of school district costs for school age children receiving special education programs and services; requires school districts to reduce their real property tax levy in an amount equal to the increase in state assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Assembly | print number 3551a |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06491 (Same As) 2014-01-29 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION