NY A03541 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the declaration of housing emergencies for rental housing accommodations located in buildings owned by certain limited-profit housing companies.
Title
Provides for the declaration of housing emergencies for rental housing accommodations located in buildings owned by certain limited-profit housing companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.275 |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.200 |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to housing |