NY A03355 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires counties to maintain a registry of people of all ages with disabilities for the purpose of evacuating and sheltering such persons during disasters.
Title
Requires counties to maintain a registry of people of all ages with disabilities for the purpose of evacuating and sheltering such persons during disasters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-01-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01126 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS