NY A03314 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide historic maritime areas program; designates certain communities as historic maritime communities; defines terms; makes provisions for survey and planning for their historic resources and makes such planning eligible for funds under the environmental protection fund; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes a statewide historic maritime areas program; designates certain communities as historic maritime communities; defines terms; makes provisions for survey and planning for their historic resources and makes such planning eligible for funds under the environmental protection fund; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | print number 3314a |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S03892 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE