NY S03892 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide historic maritime areas program; designates certain communities as historic maritime communities; defines terms; makes provisions for survey and planning for their historic resources and makes such planning eligible for funds under the environmental protection fund; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes a statewide historic maritime areas program; designates certain communities as historic maritime communities; defines terms; makes provisions for survey and planning for their historic resources and makes such planning eligible for funds under the environmental protection fund; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3892A |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.351 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03314 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development