NY A03300 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-10 - print number 3300a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-10 - print number 3300a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an expedited review process for the Atlantic yards arena and redevelopment project and subjects such project to urban land use procedures.
Title
Provides an expedited review process for the Atlantic yards arena and redevelopment project and subjects such project to urban land use procedures.
Sponsors
Asm. James Brennan [D] | Asm. Joan Millman [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-10 | Assembly | print number 3300a |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-01-24 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01607 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES