NY A03132 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-19)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the direct intrastate and interstate shipment of liquor, cider, mead, and braggot; relates to direct shipments of wine.
Title
Authorizes the direct intrastate and interstate shipment of liquor, cider, mead, and braggot; relates to direct shipments of wine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | print number 3132a |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S02852 (Same As) 2024-03-27 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING