NY A03077 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain application and referral forms for health care plans by authorizing the commissioner and superintendent of financial services to adopt regulations for the renewal of credentialing and re-credentialing of newly licensed health care professionals.
Title
Relates to certain application and referral forms for health care plans by authorizing the commissioner and superintendent of financial services to adopt regulations for the renewal of credentialing and re-credentialing of newly licensed health care professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.129 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.75 |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04335 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES