NY A03055 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to time limits for a speedy trial.
Title
Relates to time limits for a speedy trial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.247 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3055a |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.40 |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-25 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01998 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
S07006 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 7006B
S07006 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 7006B