NY A03004 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - substituted by s2604e
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - substituted by s2604e
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Capital Projects Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Capital Projects Budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Assembly | substituted by s2604e |
2013-03-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.43 |
2013-03-28 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | print number 3004e |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | print number 3004d |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-03-08 | Assembly | print number 3004c |
2013-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | print number 3004b |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | print number 3004a |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-01-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02604 (Same As) 2013-04-10 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.202