NY A03000 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - substituted by s2500d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - substituted by s2500d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Operations Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Operations Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Assembly | substituted by s2500d |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.60 |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | print number 3000d |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | print number 3000c |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-03-13 | Assembly | print number 3000b |
2021-03-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | print number 3000a |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02500 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - SIGNED CHAP.50