NY A02982 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends employer contributions to the interest assessment surcharge fund until December 31, 2025.
Title
Suspends employer contributions to the interest assessment surcharge fund until December 31, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | held for consideration in labor |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | referred to labor |