NY A02979 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-17 - reference changed to codes
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-17 - reference changed to codes
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes peace officers at community colleges operating under the program of the state university of New York within the definition of the term "qualified agencies".
Title
Includes peace officers at community colleges operating under the program of the state university of New York within the definition of the term "qualified agencies".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-17 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2011-01-21 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04064 (Same As) 2012-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4064A