NY A02942 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in any action commenced under the state's anti-trust law, the court may direct that all or any part of a criminal fine or civil penalty imposed upon a violator may, in the court's discretion, be ordered to be deposited with the office of victim services.
Title
Provides that in any action commenced under the state's anti-trust law, the court may direct that all or any part of a criminal fine or civil penalty imposed upon a violator may, in the court's discretion, be ordered to be deposited with the office of victim services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-04-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-04-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.147 |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-02-28 | Assembly | print number 2942a |
2011-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2011-01-21 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |