NY A02890 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of court administration to promulgate certain housing court documents in the seven most common languages in the city of New York.
Title
Requires the office of court administration to promulgate certain housing court documents in the seven most common languages in the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.234 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.211 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.211 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | print number 2890a |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06076 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY