NY S06076 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of court administration to promulgate certain housing court documents in the seven most common languages in the city of New York.
Title
Requires the office of court administration to promulgate certain housing court documents in the seven most common languages in the city of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6076A |
2017-05-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02890 (Same As) 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY