NY A02816 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the naming of buildings after public officials.
Title
Prohibits the naming of buildings after public officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.226 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.329 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |