NY A02788 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.294
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.294
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for taxpayer gifts for lupus education and prevention, and establishes the lupus education and prevention fund and outreach program.
Title
Provides for taxpayer gifts for lupus education and prevention, and establishes the lupus education and prevention fund and outreach program.
Sponsors
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Asm. John McDonald [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Senate | signed chap.294 |
2018-09-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1788 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5489B |
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2788b |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.221 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.88 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.88 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | print number 2788a |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05489 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2788B