NY A02757 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a plaintiff to have a small claims court hearing in the municipality in which the claim arose.
Title
Allows a plaintiff to have a small claims court hearing in the municipality in which the claim arose.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | held for consideration in judiciary |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | held for consideration in judiciary |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01053 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES