NY S01053 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a plaintiff to have a small claims court hearing in the municipality in which the claim arose.
Title
Allows a plaintiff to have a small claims court hearing in the municipality in which the claim arose.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1317 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1939 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02757 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in judiciary