NY A02734 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that members of the civil air patrol shall be entitled to paid leave for training, drill and sanctioned missions.
Title
Provides that members of the civil air patrol shall be entitled to paid leave for training, drill and sanctioned missions.
Sponsors
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Nancy Calhoun [R] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Asm. Peter Lopez [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2011-10-11 | Assembly | print number 2734a |
2011-10-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2011-01-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |