NY A02683 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - SIGNED CHAP.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - SIGNED CHAP.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the statute of limitations for criminal prosecution of a sexual offense committed against a child shall not begin to run until the child turns 23 years of age; provides that a civil action for conduct constituting a sexual offense against a child, shall be brought before the child turns 55 years of age; revives previously barred actions related to sexual abuse of children; grants civil trial preference to such actions; eliminates the notice of claim requirements for such actions when the action is brought against a municipality, the state or a school district; requires judicial training relating to child abuse and the establishment of rules relating to civil actions brought for sexual offenses committed against children.
Title
Provides that the statute of limitations for criminal prosecution of a sexual offense committed against a child shall not begin to run until the child turns 23 years of age; provides that a civil action for conduct constituting a sexual offense against a child, shall be brought before the child turns 55 years of age; revives previously barred actions related to sexual abuse of children; grants civil trial preference to such actions; eliminates the notice of claim requirements for such actions when the action is brought against a municipality, the state or a school district; requires judicial training relating to child abuse and the establishment of rules relating to civil actions brought for sexual offenses committed against children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.11 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-01-28 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-01-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-28 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.20 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | substituted for a2683 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.91 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | substituted by s2440 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.20 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02440 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - SIGNED CHAP.11