NY S02440 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - SIGNED CHAP.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the statute of limitations for criminal prosecution of a sexual offense committed against a child shall not begin to run until the child turns 23 years of age; provides that a civil action for conduct constituting a sexual offense against a child, shall be brought before the child turns 55 years of age; revives previously barred actions related to sexual abuse of children; grants civil trial preference to such actions; eliminates the notice of claim requirements for such actions when the action is brought against a municipality, the state or a school district; requires judicial training relating to child abuse and the establishment of rules relating to civil actions brought for sexual offenses committed against children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the statute of limitations for criminal prosecution of a sexual offense committed against a child shall not begin to run until the child turns 23 years of age; provides that a civil action for conduct constituting a sexual offense against a child, shall be brought before the child turns 55 years of age; revives previously barred actions related to sexual abuse of children; grants civil trial preference to such actions; eliminates the notice of claim requirements for such actions when the action is brought against a municipality, the state or a school district; requires judicial training relating to child abuse and the establishment of rules relating to civil actions brought for sexual offenses committed against children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14AssemblySIGNED CHAP.11
2019-02-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-01-28Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-01-28Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-28Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.20
2019-01-28Assemblysubstituted for a2683
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-01-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-28SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.91
2019-01-28SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A02683 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - substituted by s2440

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback