NY A02585 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - held for consideration in veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - held for consideration in veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the periods of the Iranian Hostage Crisis and from November 21, 1979 to October 20, 1981 be "time of war" periods for civil service credit.
Title
Provides that the periods of the Iranian Hostage Crisis and from November 21, 1979 to October 20, 1981 be "time of war" periods for civil service credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in veterans' affairs |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S01383 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS