NY A02569 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - print number 2569a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - print number 2569a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for state funding to municipalities for early intervention services for toddlers with disabilities and their families.
Title
Provides for state funding to municipalities for early intervention services for toddlers with disabilities and their families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | print number 2569a |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01727 (Same As) 2018-03-01 - PRINT NUMBER 1727A