NY A02561 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - substituted by s4085a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - substituted by s4085a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes air transport ambulance service providers to store and distribute human blood at all their facilities and distribute human blood and blood products and to initiate and administer transfusions of the same while providing air transport services.
Title
Authorizes air transport ambulance service providers to store and distribute human blood at all their facilities and distribute human blood and blood products and to initiate and administer transfusions of the same while providing air transport services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s4085a |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.83 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 2561b |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-14 | Assembly | print number 2561a |
2021-05-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04085 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.135