NY A02458 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - print number 2458c
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - print number 2458c
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to administering asthma rescue medications and authorizing schools to possess and administer asthma rescue medications in emergency situations to pupils with a requirement that the parent or guardian of such pupils are notified in writing of such emergency situation.
Title
Relates to administering asthma rescue medications and authorizing schools to possess and administer asthma rescue medications in emergency situations to pupils with a requirement that the parent or guardian of such pupils are notified in writing of such emergency situation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 2458c |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | print number 2458b |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | print number 2458a |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01019 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - referred to education