NY A02448 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that members of community boards in NYC need only be 16 years of age to be appointed to such board.
Title
Provides that members of community boards in NYC need only be 16 years of age to be appointed to such board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.251 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1691 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4142 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.432 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.432 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-01-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04142 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2448