NY A02358 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s3468b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s3468b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of racial equity and social justice to act as the official state planning and coordinating office for changes in policy, practice and allocation of state resources so that race or social justice constructs do not predict an individual's success, while also improving opportunities and outcomes for all people, and performing all necessary and appropriate services required to fulfill these duties.
Title
Establishes the office of racial equity and social justice to act as the official state planning and coordinating office for changes in policy, practice and allocation of state resources so that race or social justice constructs do not predict an individual's success, while also improving opportunities and outcomes for all people, and performing all necessary and appropriate services required to fulfill these duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s3468b |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.291 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | print number 2358b |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | print number 2358a |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03468 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.163