NY A02336 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires liability insurance rate reductions upon completion of a boating safety course or an advanced boating safety course.
Title
Requires liability insurance rate reductions upon completion of a boating safety course or an advanced boating safety course.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.175 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.586 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.586 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-18 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02985 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES