NY S02985 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires liability insurance rate reductions upon completion of a boating safety course or an advanced boating safety course.
Title
Requires liability insurance rate reductions upon completion of a boating safety course or an advanced boating safety course.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.449 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.181 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02336 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION