NY A02302 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the small business crime prevention services program to provide small businesses with information on strategies, best practices and programs offering training and assistance in prevention of crimes in and around the premises of small businesses or otherwise affecting small businesses, including but not limited to: assault, arson and other violent felony offenses; robbery, burglary, theft, identity theft counterfeiting, check and credit card fraud and other fraud; and vandalism, graffiti and other property damage; further provides that information on eligibility and applications for financial assistance be made available to small businesses; authorizes the New York state urban development corporation to provide loans, loan guarantees, interest subsidies and grants to small businesses, municipalities, not-for-profit corporations or other organizations for the purpose of preventing crimes against small businesses or on the premises or in the vicinity of small businesses; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes the small business crime prevention services program to provide small businesses with information on strategies, best practices and programs offering training and assistance in prevention of crimes in and around the premises of small businesses or otherwise affecting small businesses, including but not limited to: assault, arson and other violent felony offenses; robbery, burglary, theft, identity theft counterfeiting, check and credit card fraud and other fraud; and vandalism, graffiti and other property damage; further provides that information on eligibility and applications for financial assistance be made available to small businesses; authorizes the New York state urban development corporation to provide loans, loan guarantees, interest subsidies and grants to small businesses, municipalities, not-for-profit corporations or other organizations for the purpose of preventing crimes against small businesses or on the premises or in the vicinity of small businesses; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.108 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.240 |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-15 | Assembly | referred to small business |