NY A02265 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - print number 2265a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - print number 2265a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Empowering People in Rights Enforcement (EMPIRE) Worker Protection Act"; relates to the delegation of state enforcement authority to private actors; authorizes an aggrieved employee, whistleblower or representative organization to initiate a public enforcement action on behalf of the commissioner for certain provisions of the labor law, or any regulation promulgated thereunder.
Title
Enacts the "Empowering People in Rights Enforcement (EMPIRE) Worker Protection Act"; relates to the delegation of state enforcement authority to private actors; authorizes an aggrieved employee, whistleblower or representative organization to initiate a public enforcement action on behalf of the commissioner for certain provisions of the labor law, or any regulation promulgated thereunder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Assembly | print number 2265a |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01848 (Same As) 2020-02-19 - PRINT NUMBER 1848A