NY A02211 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certificates of relief from disabilities and certificates of good conduct upon discharge.
Title
Relates to certificates of relief from disabilities and certificates of good conduct upon discharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.94 |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.72 |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03313 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES