NY A02198 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.686
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.686
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases from 4% to 5%, the authorized rate of taxation for the hotel and motel tax in the county of Schenectady.
Title
Increases from 4% to 5%, the authorized rate of taxation for the hotel and motel tax in the county of Schenectady.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.686 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1516 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5761 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.485 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05761 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.686