NY A02190 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - ordered to third reading cal.105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - ordered to third reading cal.105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sex offender risk assessment instruments.
Title
Relates to sex offender risk assessment instruments.
Sponsors
Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] |
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.105 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.213 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.213 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-15 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03097 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION