NY A01982 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking in private passenger cars, vans and trucks where a minor less than 14 years of age is a passenger in such vehicles; provides for rebuttable presumption; provides that violations of such provisions shall be subject to a fine of not more than $100.
Title
Prohibits smoking in private passenger cars, vans and trucks where a minor less than 14 years of age is a passenger in such vehicles; provides for rebuttable presumption; provides that violations of such provisions shall be subject to a fine of not more than $100.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | print number 1982a |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-01-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03155 (Same As) 2016-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 3155A