NY A01981 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a uniform allowable resource exemption and disregard for an applicant or recipient with an automobile.
Title
Provides for a uniform allowable resource exemption and disregard for an applicant or recipient with an automobile.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S03136 (Same As) 2014-05-29 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE