NY A01907 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.144
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.144
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the confinement of inmates under the age of eighteen who shall not be placed in segregated confinement for any reason.
Title
Relates to the confinement of inmates under the age of eighteen who shall not be placed in segregated confinement for any reason.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.144 |
2017-01-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.20 |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S04061 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION