NY A01867 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a temporary state commission on personal privacy, in light of the rapid advancement of technology in recent years, and provides for its powers, functions and duties; provides that said commission shall undertake a comprehensive study of the condition of personal privacy in the state and how best to protect it; directs the commission to report its findings and recommendations to the governor and the legislature.
Title
Creates a temporary state commission on personal privacy, in light of the rapid advancement of technology in recent years, and provides for its powers, functions and duties; provides that said commission shall undertake a comprehensive study of the condition of personal privacy in the state and how best to protect it; directs the commission to report its findings and recommendations to the governor and the legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07092 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE