NY A01860 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires establishment of model community programs, including a model telephone reassurance program and a model visiting program for elders.
Title
Requires establishment of model community programs, including a model telephone reassurance program and a model visiting program for elders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.104 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.244 |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S00148 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES