NY A01756 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits agencies from charging for the process of a FOIL request made by state and local agencies or the state legislature.
Title
Prohibits agencies from charging for the process of a FOIL request made by state and local agencies or the state legislature.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] |
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01063 (Same As) 2022-03-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE