NY A01748 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the reproductive health act; revises provisions of law relating to abortion.
Title
Enacts the reproductive health act; revises provisions of law relating to abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.128 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.11 |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.11 |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02796 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - DEFEATED IN HEALTH