NY A01601 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 69-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - SIGNED CHAP.95
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the office of special investigation within the office of the attorney general.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the office of special investigation within the office of the attorney general.

Sponsors

Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Carl Heastie [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. David Gantt [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. David Weprin [D]
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]
Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]
Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]
Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]
Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]
Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]
Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]
Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]
Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]

Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-12AssemblySIGNED CHAP.95
2020-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-06-10Senatereturned to senate
2020-06-10Senatepassed assembly
2020-06-10Senateordered to third reading rules cal.68
2020-06-10Senatesubstituted for a1601c
2020-06-10Senatereferred to ways and means
2020-06-10AssemblyDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-06-10AssemblyPASSED SENATE
2020-06-08AssemblyORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.676
2020-06-08AssemblyREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-06-07AssemblyPRINT NUMBER 2574C
2020-06-07AssemblyAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2020-06-05AssemblyPRINT NUMBER 2574B
2020-06-05AssemblyAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2020-01-08AssemblyREFERRED TO CODES
2019-05-29AssemblyREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-05-21AssemblyPRINT NUMBER 2574A
2019-05-21AssemblyAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2019-01-28AssemblyREFERRED TO CODES
2020-06-10Assemblysubstituted by s2574c
2020-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.68
2020-06-09Assemblyrules report cal.68
2020-06-09Assemblyreported
2020-06-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-06-07Assemblyprint number 1601c
2020-06-07Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2020-06-05Assemblyprint number 1601b
2020-06-05Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-21Assemblyprint number 1601a
2019-05-21Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02574 (Same As) 2020-06-12 - SIGNED CHAP.95

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1601
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01601&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01601
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01601&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01601A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01601&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01601B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01601&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01601C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01601&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01601&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01601&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01601&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1601#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1601#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1601#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1601#SF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback