NY A01583 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - print number 1583a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - print number 1583a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of accrued vacation time toward student loan payments; defines terms; requires the president of the civil service commission to promulgate necessary rules and regulations.
Title
Relates to the use of accrued vacation time toward student loan payments; defines terms; requires the president of the civil service commission to promulgate necessary rules and regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | print number 1583a |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S09274 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS