NY A01568 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes standards for the prompt investigation and settlement of claims arising out of states of emergency and disasters.
Title
Establishes standards for the prompt investigation and settlement of claims arising out of states of emergency and disasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.145 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.145 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01476 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE