NY A01437 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring state and municipal agencies to purchase compostable single use tableware; requires state and municipal agencies purchasing single use tableware to purchase single use tableware made from material that is compostable unless there is no affordable compostable product available.
Title
Relates to requiring state and municipal agencies to purchase compostable single use tableware; requires state and municipal agencies purchasing single use tableware to purchase single use tableware made from material that is compostable unless there is no affordable compostable product available.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | print number 1437a |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07129 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION