NY A01370 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.535
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.535
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notices be posted in facilities licensed, certified or operated, by the office of mental health.
Title
Relates to notices be posted in facilities licensed, certified or operated, by the office of mental health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.535 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1324 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5121A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1370c |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1370b |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.178 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | print number 1370a |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S05121 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.535